WY HB0085 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 59 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 59 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; modifying provisions relating to higher education programs in the field of dentistry and other professional health services; modifying provisions regarding agreements under the programs; providing for accounting and use of monies generated by the programs; limiting expenditure of earnings from endowment accounts; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical education funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 59 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0037 | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0037 |
2016-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0037 |
2016-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0037 | |
2016-03-01 | House | Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |