WY HB0103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to firearms; providing that the state of Wyoming preempts the entire field of firearm and ammunition regulation; providing civil liability as specified; providing for attorney's fees and damages as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation of firearms-state preemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-30 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-30 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-30 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-29 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |