WY HB0109 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; increasing employee and employer contributions in the public employee retirement plan; requiring the increased employee contributions to be paid through a reduction in cash salary of the employee as specified; repealing archaic provisions; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public employee retirement plan-contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Adopted HB0109JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Adopted HB0109JC001: 33-27-0-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Concur:Failed 8-51-0-0-1 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Adopted HB0109JC001: 33-27-0-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Concur:Failed 8-51-0-0-1 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 119 | |
2018-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2018-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0065 | |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Adopted HB0109JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 |
2018-03-10 | House | Adopted HB0109JC001: 33-27-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-07 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-07 | House | Concur:Failed 8-51-0-0-1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-23 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 55-5-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-07 | Bill Number Assigned |