WY HB0121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state funded capital construction; creating an account; providing definitions; providing appropriations for purposes related to state funded capital construction; making certain appropriations subject to specified terms and conditions; modifying prior appropriations; providing for the acceptance and purchase of real property; providing appropriations for and recreating an advisory task force related to state facilities; authorizing and specifying requirements for higher education projects; creating a subcommittee; providing for the acceptance of contributions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State funded capital construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Adopted HB0121JC001: 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Adopted HB0121JC001: 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - Concur:Failed 14-46-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Adopted HB0121JC001: 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - Concur:Failed 14-46-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 140 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0073 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0073 |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0073 |
2021-04-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0073 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-26 | House | Concur:Failed 14-46-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-22 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |