WY HB0122 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; eliminating the inclusion of special education teachers in the extrahazardous occupations category; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Special educators-workers compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |