WY HB0153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; requiring public reports on state spending and revenues as specified; requiring the posting of state entity requests and contracts for supplies and services as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public reports-state spending and revenues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-5-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-30HouseH02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-5-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback