WY HB0196 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to dual credit course instruction; providing payments from the school foundation account to cover student tuition, fees, textbooks and other instructional expenses for participation by post secondary institutions in dual credit courses offered through distance education; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dual credit access payments.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] |
Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0196.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0196.pdf |