WY HB0217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; providing that public funds may be invested in fixed deferred annuities as specified; authorizing rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Investment of public funds-fixed deferred annuities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |