WY HB0218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Chapter No. 210 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Chapter No. 210 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registration; increasing vehicle registration fees and a related tax as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles-registration fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Chapter No. 210 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-20 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-20 | Became Law without Governor's Signature | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0121 |
2017-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0121 |
2017-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0121 | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Adopted HB0218JC001: 17-12-1-0-0 |
2017-03-03 | House | Adopted HB0218JC001: 42-18-0-0-0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-03-03 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-03-02 | House | Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-10 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-26 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |