WY HB0291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 78 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 78 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to department of health facilities; providing authorization for construction and renovation at the Wyoming state hospital and Wyoming life resource center; providing an appropriation for the construction and renovation at the Wyoming state hospital and Wyoming life resource center; providing a contingent appropriation with authority for an interfund loan for the construction and renovation at the Wyoming state hospital and Wyoming life resource center; reappropriating funds related to the level III design study for the Wyoming state hospital and Wyoming life resource center; continuing the task force on department of health facilities; specifying duties of the task force; repealing prior law related to the task force; providing an appropriation for the task force; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Department of health facilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 78 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0038 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2017-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0038 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |