WY HB0303 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; providing a tax credit for certain expenditures on skills upgrade training as specified; specifying duties of the Wyoming business council; authorizing rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming skills upgrade training tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0303 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0303.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0303.pdf |