WY HJ0001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to remove any mandatory retirement age for supreme court justices and judges of other courts in Wyoming.
Title
Mandatory judicial retirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] |
Rep. Carl Loucks [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-15 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-15 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-15 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |