WY HJ0001 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Governor Signed HEJR001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Governor Signed HEJR001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to support Taiwan's participation in appropriate international organizations and to resume free trade talks with Taiwan.
Title
Support of Taiwan.
Sponsors
Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Gregg Blikre [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] |
Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Governor Signed HEJR001 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2014-02-28 | Assigned Number HEJR0001 | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |