WY SF0023 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation; complying with federal requirements; amending the benefit disqualification period for false claims; authorizing benefit repayment agreements; providing for consolidated accounts following a business acquisition; making all employers subject to cancellation of the substitute payment option; authorizing installment payment agreements for delinquent employer contributions; providing for personal liability and liens on the property of specified officers and directors of delinquent employers, as specified; amending the threshold for incremental bonds for impact industries; amending and providing definitions; authorizing publishing the identity of state agency employing units as specified; repealing provisions inconsistent with the federal unemployment tax act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment compensation amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |