WY SF0025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Long Term Care Choices Act; authorizing a statewide network of aging and disability resource centers as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Long term services and support.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Sen. John Hastert [D] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] | Sen. Charles Scott [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0091 | |
2011-03-03 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0091 | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA0091 | |
2011-03-03 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Peasley and Quarberg. Excused: Representative(s) Berger, Greear and Pederson. Ayes 55 Nays 2 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Adopted SF0025JC01 | |
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Burns, Christensen, Cooper, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Bebout, Case, Coe, Dockstader, Hines and Meier. Excused: Senator(s) Nicholas P Ayes 23 Nays 6 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Adopted SF0025JC01 | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Cooper, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Landen, Martin, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson and Ross. Ayes 10 Nays 20 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2011-02-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Cooper, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Landen, Martin, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson and Ross. Ayes 10 Nays 20 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Did Not Adopt JCC01 | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Edmonds, Greear, Madden, McKim, Peasley and Quarberg. Excused: Representative(s) Gay and Pederson. Ayes 51 Nays 7 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Esquibel, K., Harshman, Pedersen, Steward and Wallis Nayes: Representative(s) Edmonds Ayes 6 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-17 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-11 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Craft, Gingery, Greene, Hunt, Miller and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Gay and Harvey Ayes 7 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-11 | (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-31 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Christensen, Cooper, Driskill, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nutting, Peterson, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout, Burns, Case, Coe, Dockstader, Emerich, Geis, Hines, Meier, Nicholas P, Perkins and Ross. Ayes 17 Nays 13 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hastert, Meier, Nicholas P, Peterson and Von Flatern Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Dockstader, Martin, Schiffer and Scott Excused: Senator(s) Nutting Ayes 4 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-17 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-14 | Bill Number Assigned |