WY SF0044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; establishing licensing and fee requirements for multiple employer welfare arrangements as specified; providing rulemaking authority; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-1-4-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 99 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0049 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2019-02-20 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0049 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Concur:Passed 25-1-4-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-07 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |