WY SF0049 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state land revenue; eliminating the maximum transfer to the school capital construction account from mineral royalties received from the lease of school lands; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Disposition of state school land revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2018-02-23 | Senate | COW |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |