WY SF0049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to boards and commissions; repealing the palliative care advisory council, the governor's food safety council, the division advisory committees on underground water, the health benefits plan committee, the state employee compensation commission and the Wyoming public television council; providing conforming amendments; providing for rulemaking; providing for the reversion of funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal of specified state boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number 55 | |
2022-03-11 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0023 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0023 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0023 |
2022-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0023 | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-28 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2022-02-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-18 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |