WY SF0053 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the judiciary; providing for an additional district judge for the sixth judicial district; specifying requirements for suitable facilities; providing an appropriation; authorizing positions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sixth judicial district-number of judges.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Chestek [D] | Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-6-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 28-3-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 28-3-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 79 | |
2024-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0043 | |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2024-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0043 | |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-6-0-0-0 |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-03-04 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-03-01 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 28-3-0-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |