WY SF0057 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to courts; amending requirements for filling chancery court vacancies; amending persons qualified for temporary assignment of chancery court duties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Chancery court vacancy amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 12 | |
2022-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0009 | |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0009 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0009 |
2022-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0009 | |
2022-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 |
2022-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-07 | Bill Number Assigned |