WY SF0069 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to simulcasting; requiring submission of agreements between the permittee and the horsemen's association as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Simulcasting permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | Senate | Did Not Consider in COW |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0069.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/SF0069.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0069.htm |