WY SF0070 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; providing for a back to school sales and use tax holiday; specifying items that are and are not subject to the tax holiday exemption; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Back to school tax holiday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2023/SF0070 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Introduced/SF0070.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Fiscal/SF0070.pdf |