WY SF0072 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming retirement system; increasing employee and employer contributions; providing for contribution rates by employers and employees; repealing obsolete and inconsistent language; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming retirement plan contributions-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - S Adopted SF0072JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Page 3-line 12 Before "seven" insert "six and twenty-eight hundredths percent (6.28%) of his salary in the period from September 1, 2010 through August 31, 2011 and thereafter". SESSIONS, ESQUIBEL, JOHNSON, MEYER, VON FLATERN (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Page 3-line 12 Before "seven" insert "six and twenty-eight hundredths percent (6.28%) of his salary in the period from September 1, 2010 through August 31, 2011 and thereafter". SESSIONS, ESQUIBEL, JOHNSON, MEYER, VON FLATERN (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Adopted SF0072JC01 | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Adopted SF0072JC01 | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-22 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |