WY SF0075 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; amending the instream flow application process; requiring a hearing and providing for an effective date.
Title
Instream flow application process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-09 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 25-4-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |