WY SF0077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to county officers; repealing provisions for removal of county officers by boards of county commissioners; providing clarification for removal of county officers for misconduct or malfeasance; specifying how a vacated office is filled; specifying the applicability of other law; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County officers removal from office.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0027 | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Did Concur | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-08 | (H07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-19 | (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |