WY SF0098 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil procedure; extending the statute of limitations for causes of action for gender transition services performed on minors; providing definitions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Statute of limitations-medical procedures on minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-5-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-5-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-21 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-4-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |