WY SF0103 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 18 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 18 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing for the creation of at-will employment contract positions by the legislature and the governor; requiring legislative approval for continuance of an at-will employment contract position created by the governor as specified; requiring legislative approval prior to the reauthorization of a denied at-will employment position; and providing for an effective date.
Title
At-will employment contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Chapter No. 18 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-01 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0009 | |
2016-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0009 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0009 |
2016-02-25 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0009 | |
2016-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 |
2016-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-22 | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-2-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |