WY SF0105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; amending and repealing requirements and conditions for legislative approval of the siting of high-level radioactive waste storage facilities as specified; amending provisions for small modular nuclear reactors to apply to advanced nuclear reactors; specifying duties and requirements for advanced nuclear reactors; defining terms; amending definitions, requirements and exemptions related to cost recovery for specified electric generation facilities; amending exemptions for the nuclear electricity production tax; making conforming amendments; repealing nuclear reactor requirements as specified; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Nuclear power generation and storage-amendments-2.
Sponsors
Sen. James Anderson [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 22-8-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |