WY SF0138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; decreasing the fee for malt beverage and catering permits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Malt beverage and catering permits-fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-8-4-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 65 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0037 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0037 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0037 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0037 | |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-8-4-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |