AK HB131 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the licensure of nail technicians and hairdressers; relating to the practice of manicuring; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Licensure Of Manicurists/hair Dressing
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2015-05-29 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/26 CHAPTER 27 SLA 15 |
2015-05-16 | House | 2:30 PM 5/14/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 131 AM |
2015-04-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N3 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 AM |
2015-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2015 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | NR: STEVENS |
2015-04-17 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER |
2015-04-17 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2015-04-15 | Senate | L&C |
2015-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-14 | House | VERSION: HB 131 AM |
2015-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-14 | House | PASSED Y37 N2 E1 |
2015-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 AM |
2015-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-14 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-11 | House | AM: LEDOUX, HUGHES, KITO, JOSEPHSON, TILTON |
2015-04-11 | House | DP: OLSON |
2015-04-11 | House | L&C RPT 1DP 5AM |
2015-03-02 | House | L&C |
2015-03-02 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |