NH HB1004 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 3
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 3
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to repealing the judicial conduct commission.
Title
Relative to repealing the judicial conduct commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Katelyn Kuttab [R] | Rep. Lorie Ball [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Rep. Jodi Nelson [R] |
Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 3 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 9 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/22/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 8 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |