AK HB152 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring certain employers who terminate participation in the defined benefit retirement plan or the defined contribution retirement plan of the Public Employees' Retirement System to make contributions related to past service liability and pay termination costs; repealing a requirement that employers who terminate participation in the defined contribution retirement plan or the defined benefit retirement plan of the Public Employees' Retirement System pay for a termination cost study; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pers Termination Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-03 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-04-03 | House | NR: MILLETT, CHENAULT, REINBOLD, SADDLER |
2014-04-03 | House | DNP: JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-03 | House | DP: HERRON, OLSON |
2014-04-03 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 1DNP 4NR |
2014-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2014-03-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON |
2013-03-04 | House | L&C, FIN |
2013-03-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |