AK HB232 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 1:30 pm in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 1:30 pm in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to retirement benefits and military service.
Title
Disabled Veterans: Retirement Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT |
2024-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH, ORTIZ |
2024-02-28 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-28 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2024-02-28 | House | NR: GRAY |
2024-02-28 | House | DP: RAUSCHER, GROH, SHAW, WRIGHT |
2024-02-28 | House | MLV RPT 4DP 1NR |
2024-01-16 | House | MLV, FIN |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB232 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0232A.PDF |