AK HB345 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to safety ladders at municipal harbor facilities; relating to the harbor facility grant fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Harbor Facilities And Safety Ladders
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Conrad McCormick [D] | Rep. Rebecca Himschoot [I] | Rep. Louise Stutes [R] |
Rep. Sarah Vance [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2024-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, HIMSCHOOT, STUTES |
2024-03-18 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2024-03-18 | House | DP: MEARS, RUFFRIDGE, MCCABE, BAKER, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-18 | House | CRA RPT 7DP |
2024-02-20 | House | CRA |
2024-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB345 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0345A.PDF |