AK HB378 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to motor vehicle registration; relating to drivers' licenses; relating to instruction permits; relating to commercial motor vehicles and commercial motor carriers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor Vehicles: Registration, Commercial
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 80 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-15 | House | FN3: (S.FIN/ADM) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-25 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2 |
2014-04-25 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-25 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-25 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 378(FIN) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 378(FIN) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-24 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-23 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/23 - ON 4/24 CALENDAR |
2014-04-23 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/14 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FN3: (S.FIN/ADM) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2014-04-15 | Senate | DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 3DP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2014-04-11 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | NR: FRENCH |
2014-04-11 | Senate | DP: EGAN, DYSON |
2014-04-11 | Senate | TRA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA |
2014-04-09 | Senate | TRA |
2014-04-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-08 | House | VERSION: CSHB 378(TRA) |
2014-04-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-08 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2 |
2014-04-08 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-08 | House | GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-08 | House | PASSED Y35 E2 A3 |
2014-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 378(TRA) |
2014-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-08 | House | TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2014-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-28 | House | DP: LYNN, FEIGE, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, P.WILSON |
2014-03-28 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6DP |
2014-03-19 | House | TRA |
2014-03-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |