AK HB48 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act removing from the exempt service of the state persons who are employed in a professional capacity to make a temporary or special inquiry, study, or examination as authorized by the governor and including those persons in the partially exempt service of the state; repealing the authority of the governor or a designee of the governor to authorize higher pay than is otherwise allowable for certain partially exempt employees in the executive branch; requiring the commissioner of administration to submit a report to the legislature; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Temp State Employees In Part Exempt Svce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Take from the table (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Take from the table (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING |
2019-10-23 | House | VETOED BY GOVERNOR 10/11/19 |
2019-10-23 | House | 9:12 A.M. 9/18/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-06 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 48(FIN) AM |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 48(FIN) AM |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2019 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, REINBOLD, MICCICHE |
2019-04-26 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP |
2019-04-15 | Senate | STA |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-12 | House | VERSION: CSHB 48(FIN) AM |
2019-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-04-12 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2019-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2019-04-11 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2019-04-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-11 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E2 |
2019-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 48(FIN) AM |
2019-04-11 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2019-04-10 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/10 - ON 4/11 CALENDAR |
2019-04-09 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/9 - ON 4/10 CALENDAR |
2019-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2019-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2019-04-08 | 498 | |
2019-04-08 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2019-04-08 | 498 | |
2019-04-08 | House | AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-08 | 497 | |
2019-04-08 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2019-04-05 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/8 CALENDAR |
2019-04-05 | 469 | |
2019-04-05 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-03 | House | HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR |
2019-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2019-03-29 | House | NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2019-03-29 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER |
2019-03-29 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 4NR |
2019-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2019-03-25 | House | NR: WOOL |
2019-03-25 | House | DP: HANNAN, TALERICO, LEDOUX |
2019-03-25 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2019-02-20 | House | L&C, FIN |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |