AK HCR9 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health/substance Assistance Parity
Title
Mental Health/substance Assistance Parity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2024-03-22 | House | DP: FIELDS, RUFFRIDGE, SADDLER, MINA, PRAX |
2024-03-22 | House | HSS RPT 5DP |
2024-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2024-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2024-02-15 | House | HSS |
2024-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HCR9 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HCR009A.PDF |