AK HJR42 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska creating a transportation infrastructure fund.
Title
Const. Am: Transportation Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-04-14 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-04-14 | DP: KOOKESH, MENARD, DAVIS, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2010-04-14 | TRA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2010-04-13 | TRA, FIN | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: CSHJR 42(JUD) | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y27 N13 | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 42(JUD) | |
2010-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-11 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2010 | |
2010-04-11 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-04-11 | NR: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-11 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, KELLY | |
2010-04-11 | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 7NR | |
2010-03-04 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-03-04 | NR: GRUENBERG, HERRON, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-04 | DP: LYNN | |
2010-03-04 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 1DP 4NR | |
2010-02-10 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-02-10 | NR: GRUENBERG | |
2010-02-10 | DP: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ, JOHNSON, T.WILSON, PETERSEN, P.WILSON | |
2010-02-10 | TRA RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2010-02-05 | TRA, JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Constitutional Amendments
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Taxation
Trails
Transportation
Vessels
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Constitutional Amendments
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Taxation
Trails
Transportation
Vessels