AK SB127 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to vehicle rental taxes; relating to the issuance of subpoenas related to tax records; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Taxation: Vehicle Rentals, Subpoenas
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-03-20 | House | TRA, FIN |
2024-03-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 127(FIN) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-03-18 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N4 E1 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 127(FIN) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/18 CAL |
2024-03-15 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2024-03-13 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-03-13 | Senate | DP: OLSON |
2024-03-13 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 1DP 4NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2023-05-03 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | AM: MYERS |
2023-05-03 | Senate | NR: KAUFMAN, TOBIN |
2023-05-03 | Senate | TRA RPT CS 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2023-04-12 | Senate | TRA, FIN |
2023-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |