AK SB13 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to costs of and charges for textbooks and other course materials required for University of Alaska courses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
University: Textbooks/materials Cost
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Myers [R] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Forrest Dunbar [D] | Sen. Loki Tobin [D] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Sen. Mike Shower [R] |
Sen. James Kaufman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-02-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2024-02-12 | House | DP: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, MCKAY, PRAX, MCCORMICK, RUFFRIDGE, ALLARD |
2024-02-12 | House | EDC RPT 7DP |
2023-05-08 | House | EDC |
2023-05-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-05-05 | Senate | VERSION: SB 13 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2023-05-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-05 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 13 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CAL |
2023-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/23 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER |
2023-03-22 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, KIEHL, KAWASAKI |
2023-03-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | DP: TOBIN, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, KIEHL |
2023-03-22 | Senate | EDC RPT 4DP |
2023-03-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, TOBIN |
2023-01-18 | Senate | EDC |
2023-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |