AK SB132 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act imposing an annual educational facilities maintenance and construction tax on net earnings from self-employment and wages; relating to the administration and enforcement of the educational facilities maintenance and construction tax; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Employment Tax For Education Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Sen. Loki Tobin [D] |
Sen. Forrest Dunbar [D] | Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FN4: (REV) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(LWF) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | NR: MERRICK |
2024-03-01 | Senate | DNP: WILSON |
2024-03-01 | Senate | DP: OLSON, BISHOP |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 2DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2023-05-05 | Senate | FN2: (REV) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | NR: BJORKMAN |
2023-05-05 | Senate | DP: TOBIN, GRAY-JACKSON, KIEHL |
2023-05-05 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1NR |
2023-05-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, STEVENS |
2023-04-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR |
2023-04-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL, TOBIN |
2023-04-21 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2023-04-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB132 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0132A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0132B.PDF |