AK SB151 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - VERSION: CSSB 151(FIN)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - VERSION: CSSB 151(FIN)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to police officer training; establishing the Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons Review Commission; relating to missing and murdered indigenous persons; relating to the duties of the Department of Public Safety; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Missing/murdered Indigenous People;report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 151(FIN) |
2024-04-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-26 | Senate | PASSED Y18 E2 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 151(FIN) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CAL |
2024-04-24 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-23 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FN2: (DPS) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE |
2024-03-15 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | NR: BJORKMAN, MERRICK |
2024-03-15 | Senate | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, CLAMAN |
2024-03-15 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2024-03-15 | Senate | STA RPT CS 2DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2023-05-13 | Senate | MYERS, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, KIEHL, STEVENS |
2023-05-13 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, BISHOP, CLAMAN, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, TOBIN, |
2023-05-13 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2023-05-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Communications
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Education
Employment
Families
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Public Safety
Safety
Women
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Communications
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Education
Employment
Families
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Public Safety
Safety
Women