AK SB157 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting solicitations or voluntary agreements to provide ambulance, emergency, or fire department services from regulation as insurance; relating to municipal fire protection service area boundary changes.
Title
Fire Protection And Emergency Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SB 157? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 84 SLA 14 |
2014-07-14 | Senate | 11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | BILL REPRINTED 4/23/14 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-20 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 157(CRA) AM H |
2014-04-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-20 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION (HCR 32) |
2014-04-20 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-19 | House | FEIGE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-19 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 157(CRA) |
2014-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR |
2014-04-18 | House | CRA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2014-04-16 | House | NR: HERRON, KITO III |
2014-04-16 | House | DP: NAGEAK, LEDOUX |
2014-04-16 | House | CRA RPT HCS(CRA) 2DP 2NR |
2014-02-26 | House | CRA |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | VERSION: SB 157 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 157 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL, HOFFMAN |
2014-02-21 | Senate | CRA RPT 5DP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | CRA |
2014-02-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |