AK SB38 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/6/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/6/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making supplemental appropriations for unemployment assistance, fire suppression activities, and restoration projects related to earthquake disaster relief; capitalizing funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Supp; Cap; Disaster Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/6/19 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/5 CHAPTER 1 SLA 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | 8:30 A.M. 4/1/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-29 | House | VERSION: CSSB 38(FIN) |
2019-03-29 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-03-29 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-03-29 | House | PASSED Y32 E8 |
2019-03-29 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 38(FIN) |
2019-03-29 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, KNOPP, WILSON, FOSTER |
2019-03-29 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ |
2019-03-29 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 5NR |
2019-03-27 | House | FIN |
2019-03-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 38(FIN) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 38(FIN) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-03-25 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-03-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, SHOWER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, WILSON, BISHOP |
2019-03-20 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP 4NR NEW TITLE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2019-01-28 | Senate | FIN |
2019-01-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget
Disaster
Fire Protection
Forestry
Highways
Public Land
Public Works
Special Appropriations
Supplemental Appropriations
Transportation
Unemployment
Budget
Disaster
Fire Protection
Forestry
Highways
Public Land
Public Works
Special Appropriations
Supplemental Appropriations
Transportation
Unemployment