AL HB132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin County, constitutional amendment requiring the probate judge to be a licensed attorney and expanding the probate judge's jurisdiction
Title
Baldwin County, constitutional amendment requiring the probate judge to be a licensed attorney and expanding the probate judge's jurisdiction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 326 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 326 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-02 | House | LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 326 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Baldwin County Legislation |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Baldwin County Legislation |