AL HB145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 923
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 923
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations from Education Trust Fund for the support, maintenance, and development of public education for fiscal year ending September 30, 2025.
Title
Appropriations from Education Trust Fund for the support, maintenance, and development of public education for fiscal year ending September 30, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 923 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 922 4JYZIRI-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 601 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 600 R3RWNYN-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 599 TJRS555-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 922 4JYZIRI-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 601 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 600 R3RWNYN-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 599 TJRS555-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 923 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 922 4JYZIRI-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr 2nd Substitute Offered 4JYZIRI-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote 9Z16PMP-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute Offered 9Z16PMP-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute 9Z16PMP-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 601 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 600 R3RWNYN-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Garrett 1st Amendment Offered R3RWNYN-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 599 TJRS555-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute Offered TJRS555-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute TJRS555-1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |