AL HB152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive bid law for state and local agencies, purchase of electronic data bases of manuscripts, books, maps, pamphlets, or periodicals, exempt from, Sec. 41-16-51 am'd.
Title
Competitive bid law for state and local agencies, purchase of electronic data bases of manuscripts, books, maps, pamphlets, or periodicals, exempt from, Sec. 41-16-51 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-402. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1295 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2017-02-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 105 |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |