AL HB152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., retirement system for county employees, reemployment with county, benefits not reduced if reemployed two years after retirement or after two years of reemployment, certain provisions for reduction amended and repealed, Sec. 45-37-123.54 am'd; Sec. 45-37-123.105 repealed
Title
Jefferson Co., retirement system for county employees, reemployment with county, benefits not reduced if reemployed two years after retirement or after two years of reemployment, certain provisions for reduction amended and repealed, Sec. 45-37-123.54 am'd; Sec. 45-37-123.105 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 711 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 710 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 235 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 234 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 710 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 235 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 234 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 29, 2022. |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-242. |
2022-03-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 711 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 235 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB114 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 37 | 123.105 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37 | 123.54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |