AL HB16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil Procedure, certain caregiver volunteers immune from civil action, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Title
Civil Procedure, certain caregiver volunteers immune from civil action, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 116 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |