AL HB161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes & offenses, prohibits a person from creating a private image without consent
Title
Crimes & offenses, prohibits a person from creating a private image without consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 510 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Carnley motion to Adopt - Roll Call 509 5SLUM36-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Instrument Change Q6IQ551-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Carnley motion to Adopt - Roll Call 509 5SLUM36-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Instrument Change Q6IQ551-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-24 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-16 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-16 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 510 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Carnley motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 509 5SLUM36-1 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered 5SLUM36-1 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Judiciary 1st Amendment 5SLUM36-1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 114 |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 113 Q6IQ551-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | JUDY Reported Substitute Offered from House Judiciary Q6IQ551-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted Q6IQ551-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted 7PILE2V-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted CUFPWJQ-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |